TX SJR52 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Postponed 8/18/23 10:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Postponed 8/18/23 10:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the deadline for the automatic rescission of certain applications made by the Texas Legislature to the United States Congress to call a national convention under Article V of the United States Constitution for proposing any amendment to that constitution.
Title
Extending the deadline for the automatic rescission of certain applications made by the Texas Legislature to the United States Congress to call a national convention under Article V of the United States Constitution for proposing any amendment to that constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Postponed 8/18/23 10:00 PM |
2023-05-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 18(a) |
2023-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-23 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Congress
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Resolutions--United States Constitution
SECRETARY OF STATE
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Resolutions--United States Constitution
SECRETARY OF STATE