TX SB987 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reporting of certain information regarding the payment of state money to certain vendors and counties.
Title
Relating to the reporting of certain information regarding the payment of state money to certain vendors and counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1996 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-23 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1996 |
2023-05-23 | House | Passed |
2023-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUDITS & AUDITORS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF