TX SB905 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-18 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the sale of distilled spirits to ultimate consumers by the holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the sale of distilled spirits to ultimate consumers by the holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-02 - SB 905Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-18 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-05-18 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-07 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-06HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-06SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-03SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-03SenateHouse passage reported
2013-05-02HouseRecord vote
2013-05-02HousePassed
2013-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-02HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-02HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-04-29HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-08HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2013-04-08HouseRead first time
2013-04-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-03-27SenateReported engrossed
2013-03-27SenateRecord vote
2013-03-27SenatePassed
2013-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2013-03-27SenateRecord vote
2013-03-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-03-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-03-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-03-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-03-27SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-03-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-03-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-03-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-05SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2013-03-05SenateRead first time
2013-02-27SenateFiled
2013-02-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback