TX SB329 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2013 - 75% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a prohibition on the use of a tanning facility by a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition on the use of a tanning facility by a minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-14 - SB 329Third Reading House (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Filed without the Governor's signature
2013-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-15HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-14SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-14SenateHouse passage reported
2013-05-14HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-14HouseRecord vote
2013-05-14HousePassed
2013-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-13HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-13HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-05-13HouseAmendment tabled
2013-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-22HouseReferred to Public Health
2013-04-22HouseRead first time
2013-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-17SenateRecord vote
2013-04-17SenatePassed
2013-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-17SenateRecord vote
2013-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2013-04-02SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-03-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-03-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-03-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-05SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2013-02-05SenateRead first time
2013-02-01SenateFiled
2013-02-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback