TX SB317 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to The University of Texas Rio Grande Valley.
Title
Relating to The University of Texas Rio Grande Valley.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - SB 317Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | Effective immediately | |
2015-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-13 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS RIO GRANDE VALLEY
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS RIO GRANDE VALLEY