TX SB3 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to civics training programs for certain public school social studies teachers and principals, parental access to certain learning management systems, and certain curriculum in public schools, including certain instructional requirements and prohibitions.
Title
Relating to civics training programs for certain public school social studies teachers and principals, parental access to certain learning management systems, and certain curriculum in public schools, including certain instructional requirements and prohibitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#150 (Y: 84 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - House - Amended RV#147 (Y: 81 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#146 (Y: 42 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2021-09-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#145 (Y: 41 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2021-09-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#144 (Y: 49 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2021-09-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#143 (Y: 43 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2021-09-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#142 (Y: 42 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#150 (Y: 84 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - House - Amended RV#147 (Y: 81 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#146 (Y: 42 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2021-09-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#145 (Y: 41 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2021-09-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#144 (Y: 49 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2021-09-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#143 (Y: 43 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2021-09-02 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#142 (Y: 42 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021 | |
2021-09-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-09-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-09-02 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-09-02 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read |
2021-09-02 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-09-02 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-09-02 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Record vote RV#150 |
2021-09-02 | House | Passed |
2021-09-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-09-02 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Record vote RV#147 |
2021-09-02 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-09-02 | House | Amended 13-VanDeaver |
2021-09-02 | House | Amended 12-VanDeaver |
2021-09-02 | House | Amended 11-Patterson and Shaheen |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment withdrawn 10-Bernal |
2021-09-02 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment(s) offered 10-Bernal |
2021-09-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Record vote RV#146 |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 9-M. González |
2021-09-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 8-Allen |
2021-09-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Record vote RV#145 |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 7-Goodwin |
2021-09-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Record vote RV#144 |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 6-Patterson |
2021-09-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Record vote RV#143 |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 5-Hinojosa |
2021-09-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Record vote RV#142 |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 4-Goodwin |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 2-Huberty |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment amended 3-M. González |
2021-09-02 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-Huberty |
2021-09-02 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2021-09-02 | House | Amended 1-Huberty |
2021-09-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-09-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-09-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-09-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-09-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-08-31 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-08-31 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-08-31 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-08-24 | House | No action taken in committee |
2021-08-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-08-19 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-08-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-08-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Passed |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Amended |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Zaffirini |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Amended |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Printing rule suspended |
2021-08-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING