TX SB2593 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Postponed 8/17/26 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Postponed 8/17/26 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a defense to prosecution for certain assaultive offenses involving the use or exhibition of a less-lethal projectile device by a peace officer.
Title
Relating to a defense to prosecution for certain assaultive offenses involving the use or exhibition of a less-lethal projectile device by a peace officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Postponed 8/17/26 10:00 AM |
2023-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Eckhardt |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |