TX SB21 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to drug screening or testing as a condition for the receipt of unemployment compensation benefits by certain individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to drug screening or testing as a condition for the receipt of unemployment compensation benefits by certain individuals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - SB 21Third Reading House (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - SB 21Third Reading House (Y: 98 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-25SenateRecord vote
2013-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2013-05-25SenateRead
2013-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2013-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2013-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22HouseRecord vote
2013-05-22HousePassed as amended
2013-05-22HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2013-05-22HouseAmended
2013-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21HouseRecord vote
2013-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-05-21HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2013-05-21HousePoint of order overruled
2013-05-21HousePoint of order overruled
2013-05-21HouseLaid out as postponed business
2013-05-21HousePostponed
2013-05-21HouseLaid out as postponed business
2013-05-20HousePostponed
2013-05-20HousePoint of order withdrawn
2013-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-05-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-15HouseReferred to Economic & Small Business Development
2013-04-15HouseRead first time
2013-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-11SenateRecord vote
2013-04-11SenatePassed as amended
2013-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-11SenateAmended
2013-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-04-11SenateLaid out as postponed business
2013-04-11SenatePostponed
2013-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-11SenateRecord vote
2013-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-11SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2013-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-11SenateAmended
2013-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-11SenateAmended
2013-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-04-11SenateRead 2nd time
2013-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-04-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2013-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-03-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-20SenateReferred to Economic Development
2013-02-20SenateRead first time
2013-02-13SenateFiled
2013-02-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback