TX SB17 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the training in school safety of certain educators of a school district or an open-enrollment charter school authorized to carry a concealed handgun on school premises.
Title
Relating to the training in school safety of certain educators of a school district or an open-enrollment charter school authorized to carry a concealed handgun on school premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - SB 17Third Reading House (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed |
2013-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2013-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-02 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-21 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CONCEALED HANDGUNS
Education
Education--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--School Districts
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Weapons
Education
Education--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--School Districts
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Weapons