TX SB150 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to Business & Industry
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to Business & Industry
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the maximum amount of unemployment benefits payable to an individual during a benefit year under the state unemployment insurance program.
Title
Relating to the maximum amount of unemployment benefits payable to an individual during a benefit year under the state unemployment insurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2023-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1878 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Business & Industry
HB1878 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Business & Industry
HB1878 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Business & Industry