TX SB15 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 100-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 100-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring public institution of higher education students who compete in intercollegiate athletic competitions to compete based on biological sex.
Title
Relating to requiring public institution of higher education students who compete in intercollegiate athletic competitions to compete based on biological sex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1813 (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1792 (Y: 93 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1791 (Y: 60 N: 81 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1790 (Y: 61 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1789 (Y: 59 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1788 (Y: 60 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1787 (Y: 54 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1786 (Y: 51 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1785 (Y: 52 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1784 (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1783 (Y: 51 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1813 (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1792 (Y: 93 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1791 (Y: 60 N: 81 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1790 (Y: 61 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1789 (Y: 59 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1788 (Y: 60 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1787 (Y: 54 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1786 (Y: 51 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1785 (Y: 52 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1784 (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1783 (Y: 51 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-18 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-18 | House | Record vote RV#1813 |
2023-05-18 | House | Passed |
2023-05-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1792 |
2023-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment withdrawn 10-Goodwin |
2023-05-17 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment(s) offered 10-Goodwin |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1791 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 9-Moody |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1790 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 8-J.E. Johnson |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1789 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 7-Reynolds |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1788 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 6-Gámez |
2023-05-17 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment(s) offered 6-Gámez |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1787 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 5-J. González |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1786 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 4-Turner |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1785 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 3-Rosenthal |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1784 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 2-V. Jones |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1783 |
2023-05-17 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Bucy |
2023-05-17 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2 |
2023-05-17 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) |
2023-05-17 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1) |
2023-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-17 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Athletics
GENDER IDENTITY & EXPRESSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SAVE WOMEN'S SPORTS ACT
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Athletics
GENDER IDENTITY & EXPRESSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SAVE WOMEN'S SPORTS ACT