TX SB1406 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to State Board of Education oversight of regional education service center activities concerning certain curriculum management systems.
Title
Relating to State Board of Education oversight of regional education service center activities concerning certain curriculum management systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - SB 1406Third Reading House (Y: 109 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed |
2013-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-15 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-05-15 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-29 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-04-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS