TX SB1191 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the amount and allocation of the annual constitutional appropriation to certain agencies and institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the amount and allocation of the annual constitutional appropriation to certain agencies and institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - SB 1191Third Reading House (Y: 107 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - House - SB 1191Third Reading House (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - House - SB 1191Third Reading House (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2015-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-31 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-31 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2015-05-30 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-30 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-21 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
MIDWESTERN STATE UNIVERSITY
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
STEPHEN F. AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER AT EL PASO
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS AT DALLAS
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS COLLEGE OF LAW
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT BROWNSVILLE
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS--PAN AMERICAN
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
MIDWESTERN STATE UNIVERSITY
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
STEPHEN F. AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER AT EL PASO
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS AT DALLAS
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS COLLEGE OF LAW
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT BROWNSVILLE
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS--PAN AMERICAN