TX SB1100 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-13 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-13 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Summary
Relating to the improvement of women's health by providing certain services and information related to unintended pregnancies and sexually transmitted diseases.
Title
Relating to the improvement of women's health by providing certain services and information related to unintended pregnancies and sexually transmitted diseases.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Sen. Earl Wentworth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-25 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-24 | Filed | |
2009-02-24 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1694 (Same As) 2009-03-03 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
PREVENTION WORKS ACT
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
PREVENTION WORKS ACT