TX HR994 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Robinson High School tennis team for qualifying for the 2011 state tournament.
Title
Congratulating the Robinson High School tennis team for qualifying for the 2011 state tournament.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-04-07 | Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Laid before the House | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-03-22 | Filed |