TX HR569 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Recognizing May 2009 as Motorcycle Safety and Awareness Month.
Title
Recognizing May 2009 as Motorcycle Safety and Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-23 | Filed |
Subjects
MOTORCYCLE SAFETY AND AWARENESS MONTH
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates