TX HR237 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing support for processing all data relating to local, state, and national elections and storing electronic and paper ballots and all records relating to voting machines within the United States.
Title
Expressing support for processing all data relating to local, state, and national elections and storing electronic and paper ballots and all records relating to voting machines within the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-31 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HR237 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HR00237I.htm |