TX HR2368 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Katy Koch on her selection as Jasper High School Student of the Week.
Title
Congratulating Katy Koch on her selection as Jasper High School Student of the Week.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-29 | House | Filed |