TX HR2368 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating LaKesha Hammonds of the Memorial Villages Police Department on being named a 2011 Telecommunicator of the Year by the Commission on State Emergency Communications.
Title
Congratulating LaKesha Hammonds of the Memorial Villages Police Department on being named a 2011 Telecommunicator of the Year by the Commission on State Emergency Communications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-30 | Adopted | |
2011-05-30 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-29 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-27 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-24 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-24 | Filed |