TX HR1167 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Gaylon Clark of Austin for serving as Pastor of the Day for the Texas House of Representatives.
Title
Honoring Gaylon Clark of Austin for serving as Pastor of the Day for the Texas House of Representatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-06 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed |