TX HCR217 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections to H.B. No. 912.
Title
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections to H.B. No. 912.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-27 - House - HCR 217Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-26 | House | Filed |