TX HB950 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Status: Vetoed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to unlawful employment practices regarding discrimination in payment of compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unlawful employment practices regarding discrimination in payment of compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-24 - HB 950Third Reading House (Y: 78 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - HB 950Third Reading House (Y: 79 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - HB 950Third Reading House (Y: 70 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Vetoed by the Governor
2013-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2013-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-24HouseRecord vote
2013-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2013-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2013-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2013-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2013-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenatePassed as amended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateAmended
2013-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21SenateAmended
2013-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-21SenateRead 2nd time
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-02SenateReferred to Economic Development
2013-05-02SenateRead first time
2013-04-29SenateReceived from the House
2013-04-25HouseReported engrossed
2013-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-25HouseRecord vote
2013-04-25HousePassed
2013-04-25HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2013-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-24HouseRecord vote
2013-04-24HousePassed to engrossment
2013-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-03-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-03-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-19HouseReferred to Economic & Small Business Development
2013-02-19HouseRead first time
2013-02-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB950
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00950I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00950H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00950E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00950S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00950F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB950&RcdVtNo=300&Ch=H&Dt=04/24/2013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB950&RcdVtNo=312&Ch=H&Dt=04/25/2013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB950&RcdVtNo=1257&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2013

Bill Comments

feedback