TX HB947 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to fraud, waste, and abuse in the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Relating to fraud, waste, and abuse in the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-26 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned to committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Point of order sustained |
2013-04-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
FOOD STAMPS
FRAUD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Human Services--Food Programs
INSPECTOR GENERAL, OFFICE OF
FOOD STAMPS
FRAUD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Human Services--Food Programs
INSPECTOR GENERAL, OFFICE OF