TX HB912 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of providers of driver and traffic safety education.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of providers of driver and traffic safety education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Passed (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - Amended RV#580 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Passed (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - Amended RV#580 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Law Enforcement
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PEACE OFFICERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Education--Driver Education & Training
Law Enforcement
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PEACE OFFICERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses