TX HB855 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reimbursement of state employees for groceries consumed while traveling on official state business.
Title
Relating to the reimbursement of state employees for groceries consumed while traveling on official state business.
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Rep. Ernest Bailes [R] |
Rep. Mihaela Plesa [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#950 (Y: 94 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#900 (Y: 87 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#900 (Y: 87 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#950 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#900 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-12-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB755 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB762 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Co-author authorized
SB755 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB762 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Co-author authorized
SB755 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
FOOD
Salaries & Expenses
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
State Employees
Salaries & Expenses
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
State Employees