TX HB724 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to the penalties prescribed for committing prostitution within a certain distance of certain designated places.
Title
Relating to the penalties prescribed for committing prostitution within a certain distance of certain designated places.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-19 | Read first time | |
2009-01-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB528 (Similar To) 2009-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
PROSTITUTION
Crimes--Against Morals
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
PROSTITUTION