TX HB506 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of tax-supported bonds by certain school districts and increasing the tax rate limitation on the issuance of those bonds.
Title
Relating to the issuance of tax-supported bonds by certain school districts and increasing the tax rate limitation on the issuance of those bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - HB 506Third Reading House (Y: 49 N: 92 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2015-05-13 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-13 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-13 | House | Amended |
2015-05-13 | House | Amended |
2015-05-13 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-12 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-12 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-11 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-11 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-06 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts