TX HB4641 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the collection of consumer debt incurred by certain individuals as a result of identity theft.
Title
Relating to the collection of consumer debt incurred by certain individuals as a result of identity theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1657 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Record vote RV#1657 |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2023-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
DEBT
Family
Family--Family Violence
Financial
Financial--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
IDENTITY THEFT
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
DEBT
Family
Family--Family Violence
Financial
Financial--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
IDENTITY THEFT