TX HB362 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notification provided to certain victims of criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to notification provided to certain victims of criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-17 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB362 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00362I.htm |