TX HB362 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on December 3 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain counties to enact noise regulations; providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain counties to enact noise regulations; providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-12-03 | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Environment
Environment--Noise
PERMITS
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Environment
Environment--Noise
PERMITS