TX HB3572 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-9)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-9)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration, collection, and enforcement of taxes on mixed beverages; imposing a tax on sales of mixed beverages; decreasing the rate of the current tax on mixed beverages.
Title
Relating to the administration, collection, and enforcement of taxes on mixed beverages; imposing a tax on sales of mixed beverages; decreasing the rate of the current tax on mixed beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-25 - House - HB 3572Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - HB 3572Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - HB 3572Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 1/1/14 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-25 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-25 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-24 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2013-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-05-23 | House | House requests conference committee |
2013-05-23 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-13 | Senate | No action taken in subcommittee |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed as amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-02 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-03-26 | House | Correction in referral |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |