TX HB3397 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
Pending: Senate Fiscal Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-10 - Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
Pending: Senate Fiscal Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to comprehensive reviews of certain special districts.
Title
Relating to comprehensive reviews of certain special districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - HB 3397Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--General
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC NOTICE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--General