TX HB3370 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain retired peace officers and former reserve law enforcement officers to carry certain firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain retired peace officers and former reserve law enforcement officers to carry certain firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-23 - HB 3370Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - HB 3370Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2013-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-23HouseRecord vote
2013-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2013-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2013-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2013-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenatePassed
2013-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-16SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-05-09SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2013-05-09SenateRead first time
2013-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-07HouseRecord vote
2013-05-07HousePassed
2013-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-06HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-05-02HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2013-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-23HousePosting rule suspended
2013-03-19HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2013-03-19HouseRead first time
2013-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback