TX HB3315 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a school district's grievance procedure regarding complaints concerning violation of parental rights.
Title
Relating to a school district's grievance procedure regarding complaints concerning violation of parental rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Bell [R] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] |
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. David Spiller [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#817 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#817 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-01 | House | Amended 2-Canales |
2023-05-01 | House | Amended 1-Patterson |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--School Districts
Family
Family--Parent & Child
GRIEVANCE PROCEDURES
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PARENTAL RIGHTS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--School Districts
Family
Family--Parent & Child
GRIEVANCE PROCEDURES
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PARENTAL RIGHTS