TX HB3276 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Summary
Relating to a study of priorities for awards of TEXAS grants.
Title
Relating to a study of priorities for awards of TEXAS grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-06 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-06 | Amended | |
2009-05-06 | Record vote | |
2009-05-06 | Motion to table fails | |
2009-05-06 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-06 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-06 | Postponed | |
2009-05-06 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2009-05-06 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-05 | Postponed | |
2009-05-05 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
TOWARD EXCELLENCE, ACCESS, & SUCCESS PROGRAM
TOWARD EXCELLENCE, ACCESS, & SUCCESS PROGRAM--TEXAS GRANT
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
TOWARD EXCELLENCE, ACCESS, & SUCCESS PROGRAM
TOWARD EXCELLENCE, ACCESS, & SUCCESS PROGRAM--TEXAS GRANT