TX HB3111 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tax credits for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.
Title
Relating to tax credits for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |