TX HB2988 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the disclosure of certain information and evidence by a prosecutor in a criminal case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the disclosure of certain information and evidence by a prosecutor in a criminal case.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-19HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2013-03-19HouseRead first time
2013-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback