TX HB2717 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duties and responsibilities of certain county officials and the functions of county government.
Title
Relating to the duties and responsibilities of certain county officials and the functions of county government.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-05-04 | Rereferred to committee | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-25 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-31 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local