TX HB2033 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the separate statement of the mixed beverage tax for informational purposes.
Title
Relating to the separate statement of the mixed beverage tax for informational purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-17 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Passed | |
2011-05-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-17 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-10 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-05-03 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-31 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-22 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Filed |