TX HB1979 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Texas Workforce Commission and local workforce development boards regarding the provision of child care.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Texas Workforce Commission and local workforce development boards regarding the provision of child care.
Sponsors
Rep. John Raney [R] | Rep. Mihaela Plesa [D] | Rep. Ben Bumgarner [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Salman Bhojani [D] | Rep. Josey Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#927 (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#927 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Raney |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1844 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1844 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1844 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
Day Care
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT BOARDS
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT BOARDS