TX HB1914 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to abolishing the Private Sector Prison Industries Oversight Authority and to the certification and operation of private sector prison industries programs.
Title
Relating to abolishing the Private Sector Prison Industries Oversight Authority and to the certification and operation of private sector prison industries programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | Passed | |
2009-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-23 | Amended | |
2009-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | Amendment tabled | |
2009-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-23 | Record vote | |
2009-05-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed as amended | |
2009-05-01 | Amended | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-01 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1169 (Same As) 2009-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
PRIVATE SECTOR PRISON INDUSTRIES OVERSIGHT AUTHORITY
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
PRIVATE SECTOR PRISON INDUSTRIES OVERSIGHT AUTHORITY
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions