TX HB19 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 80-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 80-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a specialty trial court to hear certain cases; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the creation of a specialty trial court to hear certain cases; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#2081 (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Amended RV#794 (Y: 90 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption RV#785 (Y: 63 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Amended RV#794 (Y: 90 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption RV#785 (Y: 63 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-25 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#2081 |
2023-05-25 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-16 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-16 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-12 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 West |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Alvarado |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#794 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed as amended |
2023-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Murr |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-01 | House | Amended 10-J.E. Johnson |
2023-05-01 | House | Amended 9-Murr |
2023-05-01 | House | Amended 7-Murr |
2023-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#785 |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment to amendment fails of adoption 8-Moody |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment(s) offered 7-Murr |
2023-05-01 | House | Amended 6-Murr |
2023-05-01 | House | Amended 5-Murr |
2023-05-01 | House | Amended 4-Murr |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-Murr |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment amended 3-Burrows |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment amended 2-J.E. Johnson |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Murr |
2023-05-01 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-05-01 | House | Postponed 5/1/23 5:00 PM |
2023-05-01 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-05-01 | House | Postponed 5/1/23 4:30 PM |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-24 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--District
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
Governor
SUPREME COURT
Business & Commerce--General
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--District
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
Governor
SUPREME COURT