TX HB1790 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain procedures for defendants who successfully complete a period of state jail felony community supervision.
Title
Relating to certain procedures for defendants who successfully complete a period of state jail felony community supervision.
Sponsors
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Lon Burnam [D] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - HB 1790Third Reading House (Y: 94 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - HB 1790Third Reading House (Y: 88 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - HB 1790Third Reading House (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 4 by Carter (Y: 81 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - HB 1790Third Reading House (Y: 88 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - HB 1790Third Reading House (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 4 by Carter (Y: 81 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-05-08 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-08 | House | Point of order sustained (amendment) |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-08 | House | Amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-29 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-04-29 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2013-04-26 | House | Postponed |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-02 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed |