TX HB1680 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to an application filed with a county commissioners court to revise a subdivision plat.
Title
Relating to an application filed with a county commissioners court to revise a subdivision plat.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-25 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-21 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-03-30 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-03-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-25 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-25 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | |
2009-03-03 | Read first time | |
2009-02-23 | Filed |