TX HB1604 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a report by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board regarding enrollment and success in higher education for students with disabilities.
Title
Relating to a report by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board regarding enrollment and success in higher education for students with disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] |
Rep. Suleman Lalani [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#345 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#345 |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Interim Studies
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Interim Studies