TX HB1487 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Internet posting of certain information regarding state grants.
Title
Relating to the Internet posting of certain information regarding state grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - HB 1487Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | No action taken in committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Open Records
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Open Records
State Finances
State Finances--Budget