TX HB124 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the addition of Salvia divinorum and its derivatives and extracts to Penalty Group 3 of the Texas Controlled Substances Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the addition of Salvia divinorum and its derivatives and extracts to Penalty Group 3 of the Texas Controlled Substances Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-02 - HB 124Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenatePassed
2013-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-22SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-06SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2013-05-06SenateRead first time
2013-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-02HouseRecord vote
2013-05-02HousePassed
2013-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-01HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-01HouseAmendment tabled
2013-05-01HouseLaid out as postponed business
2013-05-01HousePostponed
2013-05-01HousePoint of order withdrawn
2013-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-06HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2013-02-06HouseRead first time
2012-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback