TX HB1168 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption of dedicated cemetery property from drainage fees or charges.
Title
Relating to the exemption of dedicated cemetery property from drainage fees or charges.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | House | Filed |