TX HB104 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to surcharges associated with and the enforcement of the driver responsibility program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to surcharges associated with and the enforcement of the driver responsibility program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-05HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2013-02-05HouseRead first time
2012-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback