TN SJR0793 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 2014 as the Month of the Military Child.
Title
Recognizes April 2014 as the Month of the Military Child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Filed for intro. |